Multiplication Tricks and Tips

Bank Government Exam Quantitative Aptitude Study Material

Multiplication is one of the four element of arithmetics.Multiplication is one of the most important topic in all of the competitive exams. Multiplication is the Mathematical operation where one number is multiplied by another number.

Multiplication Shortcut Tricks are very important in the competitive exams as well as other exams. Time is the main factor in the competitive exams,if you know how to manager the time then you would surely crack exam.

Multiplication of two digit number to two digit number

Example 1:- 12 x 15 ?
 Step 1: Do Multiply 2 with 5 (2 x 5 = 10) Note down 0 and carry 1.
 Step 2: Do cross Multiplication of 2 x 1 = 2 and 5 x 1 = 5.
 Step 3: Add both results with carry 1 (step 1) so 2+5+1=8.
 Step 4: Multiply both left side numbers i.e 1 x 1 = 1
 Step 5: So finally we get  result 180.

 

Example 2: 68 x 57 ?
Step 1: Do Multiply 8 with 7 (8 x 7 = 56) Note down 6 and carry 5.
Step 2: Do cross Multiplication of  6 x 7 = 42 and 8 x 5 = 40.
Step 3: Add both results with carry 5 (Step 1) so we get 40+42+5=87, Note down 7 and carry 8.
Step 4: Multiply both left side numbers i.e 6 x 5 = 30 and add carry(step 3) i.e 30+8=38.
Step 5: So finally we get  result 3876.
Note.Try to calculate all steps in mind

 Assignment:
(i) 82 x 56 ?
(ii) 62 x 43 ?
(iii) 56 x 29 ?
(iv) 38 x 89 ?
(v) 95 x 98 ?

Multiplication of three digit number to three digit number

Example 1:  246 x 389 ?

Step 1: Do Multiply 6 with 9 (6 x 9 = 54), Note down 4 and carry 5.
Step 2: Do cross Multiplication of (4 x 9+6 x 8 = 84), add carry(step1) in 84, so we get 89 as a result, Note down 9 and carry 8.
Step 3: Do cross Multiplication of (9 x 2+6 x 3+4 x 8 = 68) add carry (step2) in result so we get 76 as a result, Note down 6 and carry 7.
Step 4: Again do cross Multiplication of  (2 x 8+4 x 3= 28) add carry(step3) in result so we get 35 as a result, Note down 5 and carry 3.
Step 5: Do Multiply (2 x 3=6) and add carry (step 4) in result so we get 9 as a result.
step 6: Finally we get 95694.
Assignment:
(i) 385 x 291
(ii) 598 x 983
(iii) 496 x 685
(iv) 659 x 159
(v) 826 x 239

Note.Try to calculate all steps in mind

 

Team Learn Dunia

 

 

Leave a Reply

Your email address will not be published. Required fields are marked *